Arora, Roopa Devaki (CPSO#: 66871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
867 Upper Paradise Road
Hamilton ON  L9C 5R3
Phone: (905) 574-2500
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roopa D. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 5 2007


Corporation Name: Roopa D. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Arora ( CPSO# 66871 )

Business Address:
867 Upper Paradise Road
Hamilton ON  L9C 5R3
Phone Number: (905) 574-2500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROOPA DEVAKI ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995