Arredondo Marin, Jorge Luis (CPSO#: 83165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Valle, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Dept of Pathology & Molecular Med
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76528
Fax: (905) 577-0198
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORGE LUIS ARREDONDO MARIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARREDONDO MARIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Aug 2005
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010