Arsenault, Julie (CPSO#: 89485)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton Health Sciences Corp Juravinski Cancer Centre 699 Concession Street Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017