Artho, Giovanni Paolo (CPSO#: 74644)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bern, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Dec 2001