Arthur, Laverne Sherwin (CPSO#: 80677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
150 Strickland Road
Douro-Dummer ON  K0L 2H0
Phone: (705) 652-6800
Fax: (705) 652-8373
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAVERNE SHERWIN ARTHUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARTHUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2007