Arthurs, James Richard (CPSO#: 90104)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Washington, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Northwestern Health Unit 210 First Street North Kenora, ON P9N 2K4
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014