Arzola Villalobos, Gracian Cristian (CPSO#: 83456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Chile, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and
Pain Management
600 University Avenue Room 19-104
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: (416) 586-8664
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kensington Eye Institute
Surgery Centre
340 College st, suite 600
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: 416-928-2132
Fax: 416-928-6607
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.C. Arzola Villalobos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Arzola Villalobos ( CPSO# 83456 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 19 - 104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Sep 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 14 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Gracian Cristian Arzola Villalobos may practise medicine only,

                  (I)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesiology,   University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Arzola
                        Villalobos holds an  academic  appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  when  Dr.  Arzola
                  Villalobos no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.