Asady, Mohammad Anwar (CPSO#: 75456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Feb 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dari, English, Farsi, Hindi, Persian, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 102
2338 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N1
Phone: (905) 232-1007
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners , M site
100 Queensway street west
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 9058487557
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asady Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asady ( CPSO# 75456 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga Site
Dept of Paediatric/ Neonatology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 484-7557

Business Address:
Suite 102
2338 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N1
Phone Number: (905) 252-1007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Feb 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Mohammad Anwar Asady may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics and
            Neonatology, only.