Ascher, Ilana Stephanie (CPSO#: 94904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Dec 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Schiffman, Ilana Stephanie (used until: 17 Jul 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
5927 Bathurst Street
Toronto, ONT
M2R 3T5
Toronto ON  M3J 3N4
Phone: (416) 652-9630
Fax: (416) 224-9630
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Ilana  Stephanie  Ascher  may  practise  medicine  independently in family
            medicine, only.