Asfaha, Samuel (CPSO#: 81836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Division of Gastroenterology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6582
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asfaha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Asfaha ( CPSO# 81836 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus
Division of Gastroenterology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6582

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL ASFAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASFAHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2004 to 19 Sep 2004
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2014