Ashamalla, Shady (CPSO#: 82890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room T2015
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4027
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

40 Holly St
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Canada
Phone: 416-486-8088
Fax: 416-486-7888
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashamalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ashamalla ( CPSO# 82890 )
Dr. A. Ashamalla ( CPSO# 82967 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T2015 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4027

Business Address:
South Riverdale Community Health Centre
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Phone Number: (416) 461-2493

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHADY ASHAMALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHAMALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010