Ashraf, Kaleem (CPSO#: 91630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Liaquat Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5547 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5Y2
Phone: (289) 296-4500
Fax: (289) 296-5537
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines ON
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-379-4747
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kaleem Ashraf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ashraf ( CPSO# 91630 )

Business Address:
Portage Medical Family Health Team
5547 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5Y2
Phone Number: (289) 296-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KALEEM ASHRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHRAF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015