Ashraf, Waseem (CPSO#: 78534)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Oct 2003 to 09 Jan 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 2004