Asif, Anjum (CPSO#: 91547)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103
611 Holly Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone: (905) 878-0086
Fax: (905) 878-1562
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1360 ,weber street east
kitchner
Kitchener ON  N2A1C4
Canada
Phone: 5198936060
Fax: 5198936061
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anjum Asif Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Asif ( CPSO# 91547 )

Business Address:
103 - 611 Holly Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone Number: (905) 878-7646

Business Address:
Unit 4
156 Guelph Street
Georgetown ON  L7G 4A6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANJUM ASIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011