Asim, Muhammad (CPSO#: 90157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Drive
Department of Pediatrics
Peterborough ON  K9J7C6
Phone: 7057432121 Ext. 4108
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J7C3
Canada
Phone: 7057432040
Fax: 7057434392
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON  P4N8P2
Canada
Phone: 7052676370
Fax: 7052676311
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

80 Thickson Road S
Whitby ON  L1N7T2
Canada
Phone: 9056686448
Fax: 9056684023
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Muhammad Asim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asim ( CPSO# 90157 )

Business Address:
The Hospital For Sick Children
Department of Pediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
80 Thickson Road South
Whitby ON  L1N 7T2
Phone Number: (905) 668-6448

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD ASIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 06 Mar 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2017