Asim, Shiba (CPSO#: 91337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 Lake Ave S
Stoney Creek
Hamilton ON  L8G 2V1
Phone: 905-664-9992
Fax: 905-664-9910
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shiba Asim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Asim ( CPSO# 91337 )

Business Address:
9 Lake Avenue South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V1
Phone Number: (905) 664-9992

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIBA ASIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 11 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015