Aspler, Aviva Leah (CPSO#: 87467)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 13 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jul 2001 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2013