Assaad, David Mark (CPSO#: 74719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Eye Associates
2941 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V6
Phone: (416) 438-6000
Fax: (416) 438-6206
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 801
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-7422
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kensington Eye Institue
340 College Street - Suite 600
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: (416) 928-6607
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David M. Assaad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Assaad ( CPSO# 74719 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
801 - 61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
600 - 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 929-2132

Business Address:
Scarborough Eye Associates
2941 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 438-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MARK ASSAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASSAAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 26 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005