Asselstine, Robert Charles (CPSO#: 21906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingsway Health Centre
5542 Ann St
PO Box 819
Manotick ON  K4M 1A7
Phone: (613) 692-5433
Fax: (613) 692-5435
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Asselstine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Asselstine ( CPSO# 21906 )

Business Address:
Kingsway Health Centre
P O Box 819
5542 Ann Street
Manotick ON  K4M 1A7
Phone Number: (613) 692-5433

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 29 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 29 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., July 17, 2018, by order of the Quality Assurance Committee
            of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Robert Charles Asselstine:

            Prescribing and dispensing

                  (i)   Dr. Asselstine shall not issue new prescriptions, renew or
                        authorize the renewal of existing prescriptions, authorize the
                        refill of existing prescriptions or dispense or administer any of
                        the following substances:
                  
                        a.    Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        b.    Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        c.    Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        d.    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Appendix "1"; and the current regulatory lists are
                              attached hereto as Appendix "2")
                  
                        e.    All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Appendix "3");
                              and as amended from time to time. 
                  
                  (ii)  Dr. Asselstine shall return any supplies of the substances referred
                        to in section (i) above that are presently in his possession, in
                        any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as stipulated
                        in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."
                  
            Notification of Practice Locations

                  (iii) Dr. Asselstine shall inform the College of each and every location
                        where he practises including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                        clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the
                        "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of this Order.  Going
                        forward, he shall inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
            Posting a Sign and Translations

                  (iv)  Dr. Asselstine shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting
                        rooms of all of his Practice Locations in the form set out at
                        Appendix "4".  For further clarity, this sign shall state as
                        follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                        Dr. Asselstine must not prescribe any of the following: 
                        -     Narcotic Drugs
                        -     Narcotic Preparations
                        -     Controlled Drugs
                        -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                        -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (v)   Dr. Asselstine shall post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which he provides services, of the signs described
                        above, in his waiting room(s) and each of his examination and/or
                        consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location;
                  
                  (vi)  Dr. Asselstine shall provide the certified translation(s) described
                        in (v) above within 30 days of the date of this Order;
                  
            Clinical Supervision
                  
                  (vii) Within 20 days of the date of this Order, Dr. Asselstine must
                  obtain, at his own expense, a clinical supervisor ("Clinical Supervisor")
                  who is acceptable to the College and who has signed an Undertaking in the
                  form attached hereto as Appendix "5".  The supervision will include the
                  following:
                  
                        (a)   Dr. Asselstine must meet with the Clinical Supervisor once
                              every other week to review fifteen (15) of his patient
                              charts, chosen by the Clinical Supervisor based on concerns
                              identified in the reassessment, to discuss Dr. Asselstine's
                              care and treatment plan, identify any concerns regarding the
                              care and treatment plan and make recommendations for
                              improvement. The Clinical Supervisor will report to the
                              College monthly.
                  
                        (b)   If Dr. Asselstine is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor
                              as set out in (vii)(a) above, Dr. Asselstine must cease
                              practising medicine immediately until such time as he has
                              obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
            Monitoring

                  (viii)Dr. Asselstine shall consent to the College making appropriate
                        enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, the Drug Program
                        Service Branch, the Narcotic Monitoring System implemented under
                        the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or
                        institution who may have relevant information in order for the
                        College to monitor Dr. Asselstine's compliance with the terms of
                        this Order and shall promptly sign such consents as may be
                        necessary for the College to obtain information from these persons
                        or institutions; and
                  
                  (ix)  Dr. Asselstine shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                        inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient
                        charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                        necessary in order to monitor Dr. Asselstine's compliance with the
                        terms of this Order.