Atanackovic, Gordana (CPSO#: 73178)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Belgrade, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 11 Sep 2000
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Sep 2000