Athayde, Jitendra Ignatius (CPSO#: 65191)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bangalore University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jitendra Athayde Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Athayde ( CPSO# 65191 )

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (416) 704-0377


Corporation Name: Camila Vaz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Vaz ( CPSO# 66337 )
Dr. J. Athayde ( CPSO# 65191 )

Business Address:
798 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 236-1654

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JITENDRA IGNATIUS ATHAYDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATHAYDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1996