Athwal, George Ghanaya Singh (CPSO#: 72643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
D0-2015
PO Box 5777 Stn B
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6081
Fax: (519) 646-6049
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George S. Athwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Athwal ( CPSO# 72643 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
D0 - 205, P.O. Box 5777
Station B
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6081

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE GHANAYA SINGH ATHWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATHWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2005