Atkins, Kenneth William (CPSO#: 73522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3 Geneva Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 4M2
Phone: (905) 323-9765
Fax: (905) 685-3247
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth W. Atkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Atkins ( CPSO# 73522 )

Business Address:
3 Geneva Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 4M2
Phone Number: (905) 323-9765

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH WILLIAM ATKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2003

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 16, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)