Atrey, Amit (CPSO#: 97167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2016

Expiry Date:  03 Nov 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Dec 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hindi, Italian

Education:University of London, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
55 Queen Street East, Suite 804
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5342
Fax: (416)864-5398
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amit Atrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Atrey ( CPSO# 97167 )
Dr. J. Waddell ( CPSO# 21620 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
804 - 55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-5392

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Dec 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 28 Feb 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 29 Feb 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 03 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Amit Atrey may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Orthopaedic  Surgery, University of Toronto, in which
                        Dr. Atrey holds an academic  appointment  at  the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr. Atrey no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr. Atrey's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Atrey's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is issued on December 19, 2016, and currently  has  an
                  interim expiry date  of  November  3,  2019.   The  expiry  date  of this
                  certificate  may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs  2
                  and 3 above.