Attalla, Mireille Ghattas (CPSO#: 78139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: Henen, Mireille Ghattas (used until: 27 Jun 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dixie Road Medical Associates
2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1Z4
Phone: (905) 279-1700
Fax: (905) 897-9167
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3420 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 272-0165
Fax: (905) 272-0162
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mireille G. Attalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Attalla ( CPSO# 78139 )

Business Address:
Dixie Road Medical Associates
2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1Z4
Phone Number: (905) 279-1700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIREILLE GHATTAS ATTALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004