Atwal, Gulshandeep Singh (CPSO#: 90149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Russian, Urdu

Education:First Leningrad Medical Institute, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Atwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Atwal ( CPSO# 90149 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GULSHANDEEP SINGH ATWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATWAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011