Au, Ambrose See-Shing (CPSO#: 68837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
100 Strowger Boulevard
Brockville ON  K6V 5J9
Phone: (613) 498-0444
Fax: (613) 498-4850
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3M Canada
60 California Ave.,
Brockville ON  K6V 5W1
Canada
Phone: (613) 498-5800 Ext. 2923
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Invista Canada
Health Centre
P O Box 611
Maitland ON  K0E 1P0
Canada
Phone: (613) 348-4225
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ambrose Au & Dr. Lydia Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lo ( CPSO# 63775 )
Dr. A. Au ( CPSO# 68837 )

Business Address:
Cornerstone Family Medical Centre
106 - 100 Strowger Boulevard
Brockville ON  K6V 5J9
Phone Number: (613) 498-0444

Business Address:
Invista Canada Health Centre
1400 County Road # 2E
Maitland ON  K0E 1P0
Phone Number: (613) 348-4225

Business Address:
Procter & Gamble Inc
1475 California Avenue
Brockville ON  K6V 6K4
Phone Number: (613) 342-9592

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
60 California Avenue
Brockville ON  K6V 5W1
Phone Number: (613) 498-5900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMBROSE SEE-SHING AU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997