Au, Keegan Peter (CPSO#: 89411)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Christopher Brown The Queensway Carleton Hospital Suite 105 1 Centrepointe Drive Ottawa Ontario K2G 6E2 Tel: (613) 225-1188 Fax: (613) 225-7770
Date Received: 26 Jun 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2012