Auclair, Nathalie (CPSO#: 63434)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RPO Elbow River P.O. Box 94101 Calgary AB T2S 0S4
Date Received: 30 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018