Aul, Ritu Bhavreet (CPSO#: 90089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-8136389
Fax: 416-813-5345
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RITU BHAVREET AUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2009 to 30 Jan 2009
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 02 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010