Aulakh, Lakyntiew Patsha Syiemlieh (CPSO#: 85662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Aug 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Dibrugarh University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Syiemlieh Aulakh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Aulakh ( CPSO# 85662 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre,Sudbury Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Feb 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Lakyntiew  Patsha  Syiemlieh Aulakh may practise medicine independently in
            Psychiatry, only.