Austin, Emily Beth (CPSO#: 95149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY BETH AUSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 30 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016