Autran Gomez, Ana Maria (CPSO#: 94054)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad Veracruzana, Veracruz, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 27 Apr 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Apr 2012