Avila, Maria Laura (CPSO#: 86995)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Tucuman, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Peter Gilgan Centre for Research
and Learning
686 Bay St
Toronto ON  M5G 0A4
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 08 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015