Aviles, Alberto Julian (CPSO#: 94798)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Illinois, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2012