Avinashi, Sanja (CPSO#: 89021)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Djakovic, Sanja (used until: 14 Oct 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011