Avramescu, Sinziana (CPSO#: 88763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesiology
Room M3200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Canada
Phone: (416) 967-8500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 6476181744
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avramescu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nita ( CPSO# 89300 )
Dr. S. Avramescu ( CPSO# 88763 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesiology
Room M3200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Business Address:
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8500

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 402
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 224-1922

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
Galaxy 12
Toronto ON  M1E 4C8
Phone Number: (416) 281-7476

Business Address:
Boomergan Health
9401 Jane Street
Suite 211
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (905) 553-3155

Business Address:
Neurology Centre of Toronto
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Sutie 100
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 860-7554

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SINZIANA AVRAMESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVRAMESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2013