Aw, Andrew Ta Wei (CPSO#: 91031)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology Box 704
CPCR Building
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Aw Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aw ( CPSO# 91031 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology - Box 704
CPCR Building
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 07 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW TA WEI AW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013