Awad, Imad Tariq (CPSO#: 80399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Aug 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue Rm M3 - 200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Holland Orthopedic Center
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Canada
Phone: (416) 967-8500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alarab Awad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alarab ( CPSO# 80405 )
Dr. I. Awad ( CPSO# 80399 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 380-5347

Business Address:
The Holland Centre
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8500

Business Address:
Kensington Clinic
340 College Street
Suite 601
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-9511

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Urogynaecology
Suite 8-816
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Sunnybrook & Women's College HSC
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M3 - 200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Aug 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2004 to 25 Feb 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 26 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Imad Tariq Awad may practise medicine independently in anaesthesia, only.