Awan, Arif Ali (CPSO#: 105579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIF ALI AWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2015 to 03 May 2015
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018