Awan, Kokab Imtiaz Ahmad (CPSO#: 90618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cluj, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KOKAB IMTIAZ AHMAD AWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 06 Jan 2014 to 26 Jan 2014
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Jan 2014 to 17 Feb 2014
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 18 Feb 2014 to 06 Mar 2014
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 04 May 2015 to 29 May 2015
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Queen's University, 20 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018