Awoke, Asnake Limenhe (CPSO#: 97457)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:GONDAR COLLEGE OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 23 Jun 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013