Aydin, Alper (CPSO#: 109989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2018

Expiry Date:  31 Mar 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Turkish

Education:Istanbul University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The University of Ottawa Heart
Institute
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 6967058
Fax: (613)6967080
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Turkey

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Jun 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Aug 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 May 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Alper Aydin may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of   Cardiology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Aydin
                        holds an academic  appointment  at the rank of Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  when Dr. Aydin no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on June 1, 2018, and expires on  March  31,
                  2021.  Upon renewal of Dr. Aydin's academic appointment at the University
                  of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in
                  paragraph 2 above.