Ayeni, Jenna Marie (CPSO#: 93284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Theriault, Jenna Marie (used until: 26 May 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 104
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: 9058982444
Fax: 9058985558
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNA MARIE AYENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYENI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015