Ayeni, Oluwole Omodele (CPSO#: 91063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 2015

Expiry Date:  10 Jul 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
101 - 581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 853-6644
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omodele Ayeni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ayeni ( CPSO# 91063 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 10 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Oluwole  Omodele  Ayeni  may  practice  plastic  surgery while under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College, at the
                  following locations:
                  
                  (i)   Southlake Regional Health Centre in Newmarket, Ontario;
                  
                  (ii)  Markham Stouffville Hospital in Markham, Ontario; and
                  
                  (iii) Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital in Richmond Hill, Ontario. 
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires July 10, 2019.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon  the following
                  events, 
                  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with  or without
                  additional or other terms, conditions and limitations: 
                  
                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Ayeni's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Ayeni's practice.
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 11, 2015, and will expire on or before
                  July 10, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.