Ayesha, Qanta (CPSO#: 91308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
95 Bayly st west suite 303
Ajax ont
L1S7K8
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 683-6422
Fax: (905) 683-6548
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1288 Ritson Road North
Unit 9
Oshawa ON  L1G7Z9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QANTA AYESHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYESHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012