Azarcon, Fernando Cunanan (CPSO#: 78794)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 13 Feb 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 14 Feb 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003