Azharuddin, Tahera (CPSO#: 93984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Dec 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu, Urdu

Education:Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rochester Family Medicine PC
1308 W Auburn Rd
Rochester Hills MI  48309
United States
Phone: (248) 266-9504
Fax: (888) 977-1745

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Tahera  Azharuddin may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine,
            only.