Aziz, Aly Shah Nadir (CPSO#: 91202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
581 Argus Road
Oakville ON  L6J 3J3
Phone: 905 844 7444
Fax: 905 844 9444
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aly Aziz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aziz ( CPSO# 91202 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
581 Argus Road
Oakville ON  L6J 3J3
Phone Number: (905) 844-7444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALY SHAH NADIR AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015