Aziz, Samir Barsoum (CPSO#: 83230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
1030 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 6X6
Phone: 18558002226
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1011 Upper Middle Rd East
Oakville ON  L6H 4L2
Canada
Phone: (905) 849-7007
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

340 York Boulevard
Hamilton ON  L8R 3L2
Canada
Phone: 9055251677
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

200 Terrace Hill Street
Bradford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: 5197515544
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Sep 2014
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., September 17, 2014, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Samir Barsoum Aziz:  (Note:  during the suspension of Dr. Aziz's
            certificate of registration from October 1, 2014 to January 1, 2015 as ordered
            by the Discipline Committee, the period of Clinical Supervision set out in
            paragraph 3(a) below is suspended.)

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Aziz, certificate of registration number 83230, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (2)   I, Dr. Aziz, acknowledge that I have also executed an Undertaking with
                  the College in lieu of the imposition of an Order by the Inquiries,
                  Complaints and Reports Committee under s. 37 of the Health Professions
                  Procedural Code.  I understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of
                  both of these Undertakings from the dates on which I sign these
                  Undertakings.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor who is acceptable to the College ("Clinical Supervisor")
                        for a minimum period of eighteen (18) months and until released by
                        the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Aziz, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor, including
                        reports to the College. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake to co-operate fully with the supervision of
                        my practice, conducted under this term of the Undertaking and
                        Appendices "A" and "B" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within ten (10)
                        days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within ten
                        (10) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.

                  (f)   I, Dr. Aziz, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out above, I will cease practicing
                        medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor
                        acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Aziz, agree that if I am required to cease practice as a
                        result of paragraph B(3)(f) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and said
                        term, condition and limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (4)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake, under the guidance of my Clinical
                        Supervisor, to participate in and successfully complete the
                        following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed education plan, attached hereto
                              as Appendix "B"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.  

                  (b)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake to develop a CPD plan, addressing the
                        educational needs identified in the detailed education plan set out
                        at Appendix "B" to this Undertaking, to be submitted to the College
                        for approval.  The CPD plan must include personal learning
                        objectives and a plan to meet those objectives.  The plan must meet
                        the requirements for continuing professional development set by the
                        Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College
                        of Family Physicians of Canada.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake to attend and participate in at least two
                        accredited emergency medicine conferences approved by my Clinical
                        Supervisor within one (1) year of the execution of this
                        Undertaking.  
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the conferences set out above in B(4)(c)
                        within one (1) month of completing same.
                  
            (5)   Reassessment of Practice  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake that, approximately one year after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision and Professional Education
                        set out above and in Appendix "B" attached, I will submit to a
                        Reassessment (the "Reassessment") of my practice by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart
                        review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues
                        and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment of
                        my practice, conducted under this term of the Undertaking, and to
                        abide by the recommendations of the Assessor(s).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Aziz, understand and agree that if I am of the view that any
                        of the Assessor(s) recommendations is unreasonable, I will have 30
                        days following my receipt of the recommendations within which to
                        provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I further
                        understand and agree that thereafter, the Inquiries, Complaints and
                        Reports Committee ("ICR Committee") will consider my submissions
                        and make a determination regarding whether or not the
                        recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if so, whether
                        they, or any of them, constitute limitations or restrictions on my
                        practice, and that decision will be provided to me.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        subparagraph (5)(c) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Aziz, hereby consent to the inclusion, on the public
                        register as a term, condition or limitation on my Certificate of
                        Registration, for the purposes of Section 23 of the Health
                        Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated
                        Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended, of any
                        of those recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are limitations
                        and restrictions on my practice and/or which the ICR Committee has
                        identified in its decision referenced in subparagraph (5)(d) as
                        limitations and restrictions on my practice.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise including, but not limited to,
                        hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within 15 days of
                        executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to
                        inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within 15
                        days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Aziz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or
                        any person or institution who may have relevant information, in
                        order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Aziz, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (8)   I, Dr. Aziz, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking, including the
                  Reassessment. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Aziz, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            D.    CONSENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Aziz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in clause B(3) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 

                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking. 

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Sep 2014
Summary:

On September 17, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Aziz committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession; and, that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine 
that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Aziz admitted to the allegations. 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Aziz failed to maintain the standard of practice for an emergency 
physician regarding Patients A and B.  
 
Patient A presented to the Emergency Department in September 2010, complaining of 
retrosternal chest pain that radiated to the back and the left arm, lasting one hour and twenty 
minutes. The patient's EKG, vital signs and troponin were normal. Dr. Aziz discharged the 
patient home with a final diagnosis of chest pain/anxiety and prior to discharge, arranged for an 
outpatient stress test. 
 
Dr. X, the independent expert retained by the College, opined that Dr. Aziz failed to maintain the 
standard of care in failing to repeat in six hours the troponin and EKG, displayed a lack of 
knowledge of the appropriate way to assess patients with chest pain who may have an acute 
coronary syndrome and displayed a lack of clinical judgment by discharging the patient 
prematurely without a second set of cardiac enzymes and with a premature diagnosis of anxiety. 
Dr. X indicated that Dr. Aziz's assessment of this particular patient may reflect a clinical practice 
which is so deficient in clinical judgment that other patients who present with chest pain will also 
be improperly assessed and treated. Dr. Y, the expert retained by Dr. Aziz, agreed that Dr. Aziz 
failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession by failing to repeat the EKG and 
troponin prior to discharge.  
 
Patient B presented to the Emergency Department in November 2009, complaining of blurred 
vision. There was a history of some blurred vision to the right eye with the onset approximately 
two hours prior to coming to the Emergency Department that started while the patient was at rest. 
At Triage, there were no neurological deficits noted. It was noted that the patient was diabetic 
and had a history of hypertension.  
 
Dr. X determined that Dr. Aziz's handwriting was for the most part illegible and very difficult to 
decipher. There was no documented visual acuity or complete physical examination. Dr. X 
opined that Dr. Aziz failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. Y disagreed 
with Dr. X's opinion that Dr. Aziz's care fell below the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. 
Aziz admitted that his documentation was deficient in respect of Patient B and that he failed to 
maintain the standard of practice of the profession with respect to his record keeping. 
 
In respect of the finding of disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct: 
 
Dr. Aziz failed to cooperate in the College's s. 75 (1)(a) Investigation in that he failed to 
complete and return a Physician Questionnaire to provide detailed information regarding his 
practice to facilitate the investigation and failed to transcribe his entries in 30 patient records, 
despite repeated requests and notice that his failure to respond was obstructing the investigation.  
After the allegations of professional misconduct had been referred to the Discipline Committee, 
Dr. Aziz provided the transcriptions of the charts and the completed Physician Questionnaire. 
The section 75(1) (a) investigation was completed and Dr. Aziz entered into an undertaking with 
the College dated November 21, 2013. 
 
Dr. Aziz breached an undertaking dated September 12, 2012 made in lieu of an Order under s. 37 
of the Code. Dr. Aziz undertook to practice under the guidance of a clinical supervisor who was 
to meet weekly with Dr. Aziz to review a minimum of ten patient charts at each meeting and 
discuss any issues arising therefrom.  
 
Between September 2012 and October 2013, Dr. Aziz breached his undertaking with the College 
in that he failed to meet his supervisor weekly on 24 occasions. On 15 of the 24 occasions, Dr. 
Aziz and his supervisor reviewed approximately twice the amount of charts required under the 
undertaking in an attempt to account for the missed weeks of supervision.   Dr. Aziz made no 
attempt to seek prior approval of the College to proceed in this manner. 
 
The Committee ordered and directed that: 
-     the Registrar suspend Dr. Aziz's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) 
      months, to commence on October 1, 2014. 
-     Dr. Aziz appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-     the Registrar impose the terms of Dr. Aziz's undertaking with the College dated 
      November 21, 2013 as terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Aziz's certificate of 
      registration. The Undertaking has been in effect since November 21, 2013. All steps 
      taken by Dr. Aziz between November 21, 2013 and September 17, 2014 in satisfaction of 
      the Undertaking will be deemed to have been made in satisfaction of this Order. The 
      period of Clinical Supervision provided for in paragraph B(3)(a) of the Undertaking will 
      be suspended during the period of suspension referred to in this Order.  
-     Dr. Aziz pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460.00 within 60 days of the date of 
      this Order. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 17, 2014